THE ALFORD WINDMILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
for the public benefit the advancement of education and the preservation protection and maintenance of the Alford five sail windmill by; conserving and maintaining the restored mill as a working mill open to the public ; developing the facility to attract visitors and maintaining the mill as an educational activity, to develop their awareness and understanding of the history and millwrighting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
john william james smith | Chair | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
GRANT ALLAN | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Dennis Frederick Bell | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Douglas Porter Robinson | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.06k | £16.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.81k | £19.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ALFORD ‘FIVE-SAILED’ WINDMILL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; - CONSERVING AND MAINTAINING THE RESTORED MILL AS A WORKING MILL, OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, AND - DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING THE MILL SITE AS AN EDUCATIONAL FACILITY TO ATTRACT VISITORS AND DEVELOP THEIR AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORY OF THE MILL AND THE HISTORIC OCCUPATION OF MILLWRIGHTING
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALFORD WINDMILL
EAST STREET
ALFORD
LINCOLNSHIRE
LN13 9EH
- Phone:
- 07984947799
- Email:
- dbell@mod-comp.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window