METHODIST BOYS' HIGH SCHOOL ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we do not own a land or a property
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 09 August 2022: CIO registration
- MBHS ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UKI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archibald Coker | Chair | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Muctarr Haroun Deen-Rashid | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ARTHUR BARZEY | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Victoria Gowdie | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Eustace Thompson-Shaw | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Victor Chapman | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sylvester Edmundson-Scott | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lawrence Lusanie | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Israel Cole | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY SUPPORTING THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT OF PUPILS, THEIR PERFORMANCE AND OUTCOMES, AND BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AT THE METHODIST BOYS HIGH SCHOOL, FREETOWN, SIERRA LEONE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 YESTER ROAD
KENT
CHISLEHURST
BR7 5HW
- Phone:
- +447986589579
- Email:
- accoker@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window