Accounts and annual returns AMIR JAN FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1199369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 09 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 09 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 24 June 2024 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 13 July 2024 104 days late Download Open in new window