THE BULGARIAN ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN OF RILA IN LONDON

Charity Number: 1199201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the charity is to advance for the Public Benefit the Orthodox Christian Faith and to establish, maintain and develop for the Public Benefit a parish in London, to provide liturgical services, sacrament and pastoral teaching, according to the rites and doctrines of the Orthodox Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £182,433
Total expenditure: £35,428

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE BULGARIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OF ST JOHN OF RILA IN LONDON (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dobromir Dimitrov Chair 01 June 2022
None on record
Devorina Gamalova Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Kiril Ivanov Trustee 01 June 2022
THE BULGARIAN ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST. CONSTANTINE AND ST. HELEN
Received: On time
Lambrini Ferkadis Trustee 01 June 2022
THE BULGARIAN ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST. CONSTANTINE AND ST. HELEN
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £25.53k £182.43k
Total expenditure £22.27k £35.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 14 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Chapel of St. John of Rila
THE BULGARIAN EMBASSY
186-188 QUEEN'S GATE
LONDON
SW7 5HL
Phone:
07593649270
Website:

bulgarianchurchlondon.co.uk