RAINOW INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to local childrens and adults organisations e.g. Pre School, Beavers, Cubs, Brownies, Guides, WI, Parish Council, yoga, after school club, Dog training and local individuals by providing low cost accommodation for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 03 November 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Mellish | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil Moss | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.96k | £20.40k | £11.49k | £7.47k | £10.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.02k | £17.01k | £6.76k | £15.32k | £10.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 November 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATD 15 APRIL 1970
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RAINOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Old Post Office Cottage
Church Lane
Rainow
MACCLESFIELD
SK10 5XE
- Phone:
- 01625574592
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window