SANDWICH COMMUNITY HUB: THE JUBILEE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity was established to run a purpose built community centre in Sandwich for the benefit of local residents. The Charity leases the building from Dover District Council and it runs the community centre for partner organisations that serve the community. The Charity has built a community shed and will provide opportunities in education. It aim to provide a community allotment and garden.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 20 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Wilkinson | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Theresa Elliot | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sebastian John Hamilton | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Gray | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Antony Wood | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Clare Ungerson | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THOSE INHABITANTS OF SANDWICH AND THE ADJOINING PARISHES OF ASH, EASTRY, WOODNESBOROUGH AND WORTH, WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, FINANCIAL OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Jubilee Centre
Jubilee Road
Sandwich
CT13 0QP
CT13 0QP
- Phone:
- 07595348114
- Email:
- dmawood@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window