KIND HEARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ivan Zolotuhhin | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Kustov | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrey Kuvshinov | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dmitry Morgan | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BRAYFORD SQUARE
LONDON
E1 0SG
- Phone:
- 07765344552
- Email:
- izolotuhhin@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window