ARMED FORCES VETERAN MOTORCYCLE CHARITY

Charity Number: 1199463
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Currently and in the future the charity does not collect or receive any money from any person or grant.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ARMED FORCES VMC (Working name)
  • ARMED FORCES VETERAN MOTORCYCLE CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Nelson Chair 01 July 2022
None on record
Graham Stoker Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Scott Jagger Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 19 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 19 March 2025 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2023 05 August 2024 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 19 March 2025 407 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 NORTHMOOR WAY
WAREHAM
BH20 4SJ
Phone:
07960820604
Website:

No information available