STOCKPORT AND DISTRICT WORKING LADS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520116
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity was established by Deed dated the 21 May 1889 for the physical and social improvement and education of the working lads of Stockport and the neighbourhood without reference to party politics.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £56,908
Total expenditure: £52,315

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • STOCKPORT LADS CLUB (Working name)
  • STOCKPORT AND DISTRICT WORKING LADS' CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Hall Chair 04 August 2014
STOCKPORT PLAYING FIELDS SOCIETY
Received: On time
JEANETTE LADD Trustee 16 January 2019
SHOPMOBILITY STOCKPORT
Received: On time
Councillor Wendy Meikle Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
Brian Guest Trustee 13 November 2015
None on record
John Guest Trustee 13 November 2015
None on record
Chris Barber Trustee 13 November 2015
STOCKPORT PLAYING FIELDS SOCIETY
Received: On time
ALEXANDER PAUL FRASER NELSTROP Trustee 26 September 2012
STOCKPORT PLAYING FIELDS SOCIETY
Received: On time
MR S TATTERSALL Trustee
STOCKPORT PLAYING FIELDS SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.73k £41.05k £63.35k £110.85k £56.91k
Total expenditure £56.36k £38.25k £54.15k £81.28k £52.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 March 2025 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 March 2025 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hempshaw Lane
Stockport
CHESHIRE
SK1 4NT
Phone:
07773421209
Website:

No information available