READ EASY NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1200445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide one to one coaching to improve adult literacy in Nottingham area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £2,388
Total expenditure: £2,304

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Chambers Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Craig Sharples Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Fiona Bianca Pearson Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.38k £2.39k
Total expenditure £1.36k £2.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46 Violet Road
West Bridgford
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 5HA
Phone:
07721533296
Website:

No information available