HELP FOR UKRAINE APPEAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief and assistance of people in need arising from the war/conflict in Ukraine with a focus on women and children primarily by providing funding to charities, orphanages and schools in order to meet such needs. We will operate in Ukraine, Poland and UK Our biggest project to date has involved providing supplies to an orphanage in Torun, Poland that is caring for disabled Ukrainian children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Poland
- Ukraine
Governance
- 09 August 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Ellerker | Chair | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr andrzej frygier | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
shaun willox | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.49k | £13.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41k | £7.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07 AUG 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED ARISING FROM THE WAR/CONFLICT IN UKRAINE WITH A FOCUS ON WOMEN AND CHILDREN PRIMARILY BY PROVIDING FUNDING TO CHARITIES, ORPHANAGES AND SCHOOLS IN ORDER TO MEET SUCH NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 BULL PASTURE
SOUTH CAVE
BROUGH
HU15 2HT
- Phone:
- 01430424775
- Email:
- shaun.willox@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window