TARVIN YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 520122
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Club organises games and activities for the members in and out of the club house and invites in external organisations to introduce other activities/skills. The Club has the following equipment: table tennis, pool, TV games, board games, table football and a tuck shop.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £5,120
Total expenditure: £4,474

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1965: Standard registration
  • 15 August 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 15 August 2017: Funds transferred to 1070307 1ST TARVIN SCOUT GROUP
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • TARVIN YOUTH CLUB SUPPORTERS (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £5.37k £4.14k £5.56k £4.67k £5.12k
Total expenditure £4.42k £5.78k £5.97k £4.47k £4.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 31 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required