THINGWALL RECREATIONAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises activities such as indoor & outdoor bowls, whist, bridge, drama, badminton, cycling, artists classes etc. The premises are also used by outside organisations for karate classes, keep fit, aerobics, children dance classes etc. Parties and receptions may also be held in the main hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 14 November 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Holmes Treasurer | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mountford Secretary | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allen Mclaughlin Chair | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Tilston | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PETERS | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MONTGOMERY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.17k | £30.22k | £34.58k | £30.88k | £24.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.41k | £23.66k | £29.16k | £50.16k | £23.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | £22.37k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 1998 as amended on 23 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
THINGWALL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THINGWALL RECREATION CENTRE
51 SPARKS LANE
HESWALL
WIRRAL
CH61 7XE
- Phone:
- 01516484120
- Email:
- pmountford7887@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window