Financial history TIVERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.52k £16.68k £1.78k £1.97k £3.61k
Total expenditure £2.03k £1.16k £2.38k £3.89k £4.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.34k N/A N/A N/A