HEARTLINK EALING HOSPITAL HEART SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise educational seminars, Run a Heart Health Info Desk, Visit patients in hospital, Provide a telephone help line, Run a Community Hub, Organise Day Trips, Have a weekly walk group, Hold social events, Support the Cardiology Dept at Ealing Hospital, Work in the wider community to promote heart health, raise awareness of heart disease, its causes, treatments and help that is available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,000 from 3 government contract(s) and £8,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 28 July 2022: Standard registration
- HEARTLINK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Diamant | Chair | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nabeel Ahmed | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Byrne | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lolin Jones | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jaspal Singh Kooner | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amarjit Singh Sethi | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary La Touche | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harmandeep Singh | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 APR 2022 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM HEART DISEASE IN THE BOROUGH OF EALING AND SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROVIDING REGULAR SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND MEETINGS FOR THOSE SUFFERING WITH HEART DISEASE IN ORDER TO HELP RELIEVE ANXIETY, REDUCE ISOLATION AND PROMOTE HEALTHY LIFESTYLES BY INTERACTING WITH OTHERS WHO SHARE SIMILAR EXPERIENCES AND HAVE AN UNDERSTANDING OF THEIR NEEDS; B) WORKING WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY TO PROMOTE HEART HEALTH AND RAISE AWARENESS OF HEART DISEASE, ITS CAUSES, TREATMENTS, IMPLICATIONS AND HELP THAT IS AVAILABLE; C) SUPPORTING PATIENT CARE AT THE CARDIOLOGY DEPARTMENT AT EALING HOSPITAL BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND OTHER FORMS OF COMFORT AND SUPPORT NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEARTLINK C/O Dr Harmandeep Singh
Cardiology Dept 2nd Floor
Ealing Hospital LNWUH Trust
Uxbridge Road
Southall Mddx
UB1 3HW
- Phone:
- 03001024575
- Email:
- info@ealingheartgroup.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window