Trustees HEARTLINK EALING HOSPITAL HEART SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1199840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bernard Diamant Chair 05 October 2023
None on record
Dr Nabeel Ahmed Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Barbara Byrne Trustee 03 April 2024
None on record
Lolin Jones Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Professor Jaspal Singh Kooner Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
Dr Amarjit Singh Sethi Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Gary La Touche Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Dr Harmandeep Singh Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record