IPAS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Argentina
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Cameroon
- Chile
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- El Salvador
- Ethiopia
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Honduras
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Senegal
- South Africa
- Togo
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 04 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pansi Pam Katenga | Chair | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Barclay | Trustee |
|
||||||
Julia Hopper | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, AND FACILITATION OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH SERVICES INCLUDING ABORTION, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN RELATION TO SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH SERVICES INCLUDING ABORTION: B. THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND CONSULTATION REGARDING THE NEED FOR AND DELIVERY OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE AND RIGHTS. C. THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND TRAINING ON THE NEED FOR AND PROVISION OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE AND RIGHTS INCLUDING ABORTION; AND D. THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, TRAINING, AND ADVICE ON STANDARDS FOR THE PROVISION OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE AND RIGHTS, INCLUDING ABORTION
Contact information
- Address:
-
LYTCHETT HOUSE
UNIT 13 FREELAND PARK
WAREHAM ROAD
LYTCHETT MATRAVERS
POOLE
BH16 6FA
- Phone:
- 07764944531
- Email:
- KatengaP@ipas.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window