THE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION IN WORCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We arrange weekly spiritual/ Social meeting, in which we run Sunday school activities for children and spiritual meeting for adults. Also once a month we run liturgy services. All this is done in rented village halls. We organize as well spiritual and social activities for our congregation on random basis. Also we provide logistic, and practical help and support to the new comers to the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Hanna | Chair | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kyrillos Ibrahim | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Sobhy | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samer Shenouda | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jan Abdelmisseh | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.48k | £13.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.98k | £5.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND PRACTICES OF THE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT ENGLAND MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS, OFFICIATING THE SACRAMENTS, SUNDAY SCHOOL ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN, SPIRITUAL MEETINGS, CONFERENCES AND EVENTS FOR ADULTS AND TO PROVIDE PASTORAL CARE FOR THE NEWLY COMERS, IMMIGRANTS AND FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Harrison Grove
WORCESTER
WR5 1SS
- Phone:
- 07769898550
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window