MAHAYOGI SIDDHABABA SPIRITUAL ACADEMY, UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit in the practices of Himalayan Siddha Mahayoga and Meditation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Govinda Prasad Ghimire | Chair | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Udaya Raj Lamsal | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laxman Krishna Shrestha | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE PRACTICES OF HIMALAYAN SIDDHA MAHAYOGA AND MEDITATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 WHITTON AVENUE EAST
GREENFORD
UB6 0QB
- Phone:
- 07854311619
- Email:
- uk@siddhamahayogacademy.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window