MARANATA FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maranata Fellowship will provide support for the public benefit, to relief those in need in Romania and Uganda through the provision of grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organizations, working to assist such individuals. It will focus on the advancement of Christian faith through its own representatives or with the aid of other NGO's.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- Romania
- Uganda
Governance
- 21 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrei Gyongyosi Mr | Chair | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vasile Cornea Mr | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ionut Valentin Baruta Mr | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2022 as amended on 15 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN ROMANIA AND UGANDA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS, AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS, WORKING TO ASSIST SUCH INDIVIDUALS. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ROMANIA AND UGANDA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS AND REGISTERED CHARITIES TO ASSIST IN BUILDING AND ESTABLISHING CHURCHES. 3)ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH WITHIN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS AND BIBLE STUDY, RAISING AWARENESS OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, CELEBRATING RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, OUTREACH, AND PASTORAL CARE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST THE SERVANT CHURCH
STOCKWOOD ROAD
BRISTOL
BS14 8HS
- Phone:
- 07563360965
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window