YOU'RE CHERISHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
You're Cherished provides support to primary and secondary children and young people between the age of 4-17 years of old. Mentoring and group work takes place in schools, colleges, PRU's and in after school managed groups in church halls and other similar venues. Support is available within term time and during the school holidays. Cherished have a team of employees, mentors and volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £9,472 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Boast | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Morton | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Sacco | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH PARTS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, ARE: 1) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED ADVERSE CHILDHOOD EXPERIENCES, BY PROVIDING PROGRAMMES WHICH: (A) ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (C) PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN CHILDREN’S MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND SUPPORTING CHILDREN WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED ADVERSE CHILDHOOD EXPERIENCES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING WORKSHOPS AND CONFERENCES TO PARENTS/CARERS AND PROFESSIONALS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHOSE WORK INVOLVES CONTACT WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE ADVERSE CHILDHOOD EXPERIENCES (ACES) ARE DEFINED AS HIGHLY STRESSFUL, AND POTENTIALLY TRAUMATIC, EVENTS OR SITUATIONS THAT OCCUR DURING CHILDHOOD AND/OR ADOLESCENCE. THEY CAN BE A SINGLE EVENT, OR PROLONGED THREATS TO, AND BREACHES OF, THE YOUNG PERSON’S SAFETY, SECURITY, TRUST OR BODILY INTEGRITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
You're Cherished
126 Gracechurch Shopping Centre
The Parade
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B72 1PH
- Phone:
- 01213898244
- Email:
- admin@cherisheduk.org
- Website:
-
WWW.CHERISHEDUK.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window