13TH STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NEWCASTLE (1ST ALSAGER) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 November 1968: Standard registration
- 1st Alsager Scout Group (Working name)
- FIRST ALSAGER SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Calleran | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dave Huss | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Evans | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andy Ellis | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Smith | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY AMBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DON LONGHURST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIVE AMBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.74k | £32.68k | £78.56k | £54.33k | £72.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.56k | £36.93k | £69.15k | £57.09k | £81.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.17k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1967 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
ALSAGER
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 SINCLAIR AVENUE
ALSAGER
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST7 2XL
- Phone:
- 01270882795
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window