THE RED SHED PROJECT CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Red Shed CIO provides gardening and garden inspired activities for people living with dementia and their carers in Hertfordshire. Our aim is to improve the mental and physical wellbeing of our participants and to reduce the effects of isolation. We do this through weekly garden clubs run in our dementia friendly, all access garden in Bedwell, Stevenage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 29 March 2023: CIO registration
- THE RED SHED PROJECT COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- THE RED SHED PROJECT COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Webb | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Williams | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Arceno | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan White | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Hamilton | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lesley Frost | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Ian Brown | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREAS: 1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THOSE PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS THROUGH HORTICULTURE, GARDENING AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL). 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA OR DEMENTIA RELATED CONDITIONS BY PROVIDING CARE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE ENHANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELL-BEING NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 BENSLOW LANE
HITCHIN
SG4 9RE
- Phone:
- 07788725110
- Email:
- info.theredshed@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window