3RD ASHTON-UPON-MERSEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are part of the Scouts Organisation. The purpose of Scouting is to contribute to the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Trafford
Governance
- 02 April 1963: Standard registration
- 3RD ASHTON SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON MURRAY | Chair | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sean Cameron Warman | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Thomas Yarwood | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fay Brocklebank | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY YARWOOD | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Roberts | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Thompson | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Westhead | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALASDAIR FERRO | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR HARRY PEET | Trustee | 01 September 2002 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GOODSTADT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREA MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BLAIRS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.36k | £44.94k | £31.58k | £34.44k | £28.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.91k | £46.70k | £36.50k | £35.87k | £32.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 29TH MARCH 1961 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 3RD ASHTON SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
SALE, ASHTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 CARRINGTON LANE
SALE
M33 5ND
- Phone:
- 07814536324
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
3rdashton.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window