THE PETERS FAMILY FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants in furtherance of the purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN PETERS | Chair | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Schmidt | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helene Peters | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stefan Schaefers | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £241.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5 | £181.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND CONTINENTAL EUROPE ARE TO PROVIDE GRANTS FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE. NOTHING IN THIS CIO CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
109-111 Fulham Palace Road
LONDON
W6 8JA
- Phone:
- 07798743921
- Email:
- jeanpeters561@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window