ENGAGING YOUTHS IN ANTI-CORRUPTION AND CYBERCRIME EDUCATION (EYACE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At ENGAGING YOUTHS IN ANTI-CORRUPTION EDUCATION, we provide anti-corruption education to Youths, to help rewind systemic fraud and corruption issues in developing counties particularly in Africa's developing Countries. We teach youths in primary schools, secondary schools and University levels across Africa, including Nigeria, Ghana, Kenya, and Cameroon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cameroon
- Kenya
- Nigeria
Governance
- 07 July 2022: CIO registration
- ENGAGING YOUTHS IN ANTI-CORRUPTION EDUCATION (EYACE) (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellen Deve | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Njah | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
NNAMDI GEORGE AYOKA-UWA | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jul 2022 as amended on 11 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AFRICAN COUNTRIES :- A) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW BY GOVERNMENTAL, INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL, VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND PROFESSIONAL ORGANISATIONS IN INTERNATIONAL AND DOMESTIC BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS AND OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN BUSINESS ETHICS AND RELATED SUBJECTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE STUDY AND APPLICATION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS AND THE ELIMINATION OR REDUCTION OF CORRUPTION IN THE FIELD OF INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT IN POOR COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 3
PEEL HOUSE
PEEL HOUSE
30 THE DOWNS
ALTRINCHAM
- Phone:
- 07563250157
- Email:
- dandisonjude@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window