ORPHAN CHILDREN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working to relieve poverty among the orphaned children in the UK and Pakistan
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 20 June 2022: CIO registration
- ORPHAN CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIRFRAZ ALI-CHOUDHRY | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED NASAR | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
FREED CHAUDHARI | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.59k | £7.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.44k | £2.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ORPHANED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SHELTER, FOOD, CLOTHING, BEDDING, ESSENTIAL ITEMS, EDUCATION AND MEDICINES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED TO SUPPORT THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Beechwood Road
LUTON
LU4 8RR
- Phone:
- 03000306005
- Email:
- info@orphanchildren.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window