Accounts and annual returns AL- HERA FOUNDATION FOR POOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1199750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 March 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 March 2024 52 days late Download Open in new window