AL- HERA FOUNDATION FOR POOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1199750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING BOOKS, SCHOOL UNIFORMS, STATIONERY AND SCHOOL MEALS TO POOR CHILDREN WHO ARE UNABLE TO ATTEND SCHOOL DUE TO POVERTY AND LACK OF RESOURCES IN BANGLADESH AND TO SUPPORT THEIR PARENTS OR GUARDIANS BY PROVIDING THEM WITH HELP AND SUPPORT TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,700
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bangladesh

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMMED SHAHID Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
MAWLANA RUHUL AMIN Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record
KALAM CHOUDHURY Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £1.70k
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 March 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 March 2024 52 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 TANNERS LANE
ILFORD
IG6 1QJ
Phone:
07957201682
Website:

No information available