PTSD RESOLUTION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES FREE TREATMENT TO UK MILITARY VETERANS, RESERVISTS AND FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM THE SYMPTOMS OF POST TRAUMATIC STRESS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£794,930
Donations and legacies | £291.13k | |
Charitable activities | £7.04k | |
Other trading activities | £332 | |
Investments | £8.16k | |
Other | £488.28k |
Total expenditure:
£287,823
Raising funds | £20.67k | |
Charitable activities | £267.15k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £20.67k | |
Charitable expenditure | £267.15k | |
Retained for future use | £507.11k |
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 April 2023: CIO registration
- 07 October 2024: Funds received from 1133188 PTSD RESOLUTION LTD
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony de Putron Gauvain | Chair |
|
||||||
David Piers Mackie Bishop | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Patrick Mark William Rea | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm Hanson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rosalind Townsend | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Charles Highett | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gregory Vosper | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nicole Anne Lander | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM BASSETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £794.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £287.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £291.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £332 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.16k | |
|
Income - Other | £488.28k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £45.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £267.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £20.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £528.70k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £21.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THE MENTAL SICKNESS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO POST-TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER (PTSD) OF VETERANS AND RESERVISTS OF THE UK ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILY MEMBERS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FREE COUNSELLING, PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC TREATMENT, AND SOCIAL SUPPORT AND BY: (A) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO TREATING POST-TRAUMATIC SYMPTOMS, AND PROMOTING NEW WAYS OF PROVIDING SERVICES; (B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS, GROUPS, ORGANISATIONS AND THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL IN UNDERSTANDING PTSD AND OTHER MENTAL ILLNESSES; (C) PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION OF VETERANS WITH PTSD AND OTHER MENTAL CONDITIONS, IN GENERAL AND, IN PARTICULAR, IN PRISONS, THROUGH COUNSELLING, TREATMENT AND SOCIAL SUPPORT; (D) MAKING BEST USE OF THE CIO?S EXPERIENCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE BEST PRACTICE IN MENTAL HEALTH TREATMENT BY PROVIDING TRAINING ON A CONTRACTUAL BASIS TO PUBLIC SERVICE ORGANISATIONS; AND (E) PROVIDING TRAINING AND SUPPORT TO, AND SHARE BEST PRACTICE WITH THERAPISTS AND GROUPS OF THERAPISTS WHO DEAL WITH PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED TRAUMA FROM FOREIGN WAR ZONES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHANTRY HOUSE
22 UPPERTON ROAD
EASTBOURNE
BN21 1BF
- Phone:
- 03003020551
- Email:
- contact@ptsdresolution.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window