KAFUTI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training or advice is provided to the members of the community. Language skills, IT skills and Health/debt/money management advice. Employment information. Housing benefit support information. Help and support with translation and interpretation. Run family meeting on sharing experience. Help on completing benefit forms and help on mentoring young people in difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mayasi | Chair | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Niemba Ndombele | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gauthier Lusanda | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67k | £5.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LONDON AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL ECONOMIC POSITION, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSESS THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ENABLE SUCH PEOPLE TO INTEGRATE AND ADAPT TO LIFE WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY; AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN LONDON THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Capital Office
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 077849891232
- Email:
- info@kafutitrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window