JACOB'S ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jacobs Academy will work to improve the educational prospects of the Young Men and Women throughout the UK, Europe and Africa in and hope to prevent poverty, it is our mission to provide vocational training and online courses to young men and women in Computing, Art, Media, Graphic Design and many more. Providing educational funding, food and basic hygienic materials to prevention poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 17 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARRYLL YAW OWUSU-AGYEMAN | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olatunbosun Gbolahan Sadare | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Israel | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14k | £2.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | £1.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE INCLUDING BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD INCLUDING BY PROMOTING VOCATIONAL LEARNING AND MAKING GRANTS TO ENABLE PEOPLE IN POVERTY TO UNDERTAKE VOCATIONAL LEARNING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167 - 169 Great portland Street
5th floor London
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07588699661
- Email:
- register@jacobsacademy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window