ANYTIME GIVE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty through supporting the needy with food items, clothing, medical and educational needs. To alleviate poverty by assisting the needy in dealing with burial expenses of the deceased.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- India
- Mauritania
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Sudan
Governance
- 27 January 2023: CIO registration
- ANYTIME GIVE (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhamad NAWAB | Chair | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAVAID IMRAN SARWAR | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rasheed Saliu | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Soheel PIRBHAI | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akdas ALI | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1. RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGH SUPPORTING THE NEEDY WITH FOOD ITEMS, CLOTHING, MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2. TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY BY ASSISTING THE NEEDY IN DEALING WITH BURIAL EXPENSES OF THE DECEASED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Aacsl Accountants Ltd
1st Floor North Westgate House
THE HIGH
HARLOW
- Phone:
- +442081254999
- Email:
- Info@anytimegive.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window