THE COMMUNITY HOPE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 21 December 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Bufton | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE BUFTON | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Janice Preen | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Teressa Brown | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Maureen Wendy Gough | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS/ORGANISATIONS OR CHARITIES WORKING TOWARD PROVIDING SUCH RELIEF IN THE BOROUGH OF BLAENAU GWENT, WITH A PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON: DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN WHO ARE IN FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM CHALLENGING ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR CHILDREN LIVING IN POTENTIALLY DANGEROUS HOME SITUATIONS; HOMELESS INDIVIDUALS OR THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS; AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH LIFE THREATENING OR TERMINAL ILLNESSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
A STITCH IN TIME
15 MARKET SQUARE
BRYNMAWR
EBBW VALE
NP23 4AJ
- Phone:
- 07857005113
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window