Financial history CHEADLE AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.06k £25.88k £26.63k £18.93k £16.07k
Total expenditure £34.38k £15.86k £18.22k £30.97k £16.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £8.00k N/A N/A