1ST GATLEY (ST JAMES) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helps young people to try to achieve their full potential as responsible citizens in their communities both local and national by training given under the guidance of the Scout Association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £46,000
Total expenditure: £39,249

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST GATLEY (ST JAMES) GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE ELIZABETH MCKENZIE Chair 27 October 2011
None on record
Dean Belfield Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
KAYE BARTON Trustee 27 October 2011
None on record
WILLIAM JAMES HOLLINGSHEAD Trustee 27 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.65k £37.49k £37.54k £54.48k £46.00k
Total expenditure £27.42k £12.25k £24.22k £56.92k £39.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.34k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GATLEY HILL HOUSE LIBRARY
CHURCH ROAD
CHEADLE
CHEADLE
SK8 3EY
Phone:
07802789350
Website:

No information available