YASMIN'S GIVING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 June 2022: CIO registration
- YASMIN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Tousif Ahmed | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KHADIJA ILYAS MAMUN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YASMIN AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2025 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 April 2025 | 437 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY, ESSENTIAL ITEMS AND SERVICES FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 MOORSIDE AVENUE
BOLTON
BL1 6BE
- Phone:
- 01204565909
- Website:
-
YASMINFOUNDATION.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window