MOOSA AND HAWABOO RAVAT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 07 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM RAVAT | Chair |
|
||||||
YUSUFBHAI IBRAHIM ESHAT | Trustee |
|
||||||
RASID AHMED MAHMAD BHAI ISAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAJRA EBRAHIM PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 May 2025 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND WORSHIP, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS INTERPRETED AND ACCEPTED BY THE AHLE-SUNNAH WAL-JAMAA-AH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; 2. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER, COSTS FOR ATTENDING SCHOOL AND COSTS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 HILLSWAY
LITTLEOVER
DERBY
DE23 3DU
- Phone:
- 07933190020
- Email:
- adamravat60@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window