THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD EVERLASTING FATHER'S ABODE WAKEFIELD

Charity Number: 1199532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The organisation operates as a church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £117,430
Total expenditure: £68,569

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gabriel Ademola Adunmade Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
OLANREWAJU FAKUNLE Trustee 25 January 2025
None on record
BOLA ADESANYA Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Dr Adebayo Olufemi Ola Trustee 19 February 2021
None on record
OLUWATOYIN ADUNNI OGUNTADE Trustee 19 February 2021
None on record
Phebean Arinola Oyelade Trustee 19 February 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.22k £117.43k
Total expenditure £38.16k £68.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Funny Gals Wakefield Ltd
Bank Street
WAKEFIELD
West Yorkshire
WF1 1EH
Phone:
07932908343