PLASNEWYDD OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing high quality out of hours play activities and childcare for children in the Plasnewydd area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 22 July 2022: CIO registration
- POOSC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susannah Ventris-Field | Chair | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martina Portanti | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elizabeth McNutt | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
09 August 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ROATH PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL
PEN Y WAIN ROAD
CARDIFF
CF24 4BB
- Phone:
- 0776 6654532
- Email:
- pooscclubs@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window