NUESTRA ESCUELA CARDIFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching Spanish language to children with Hispanic background
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2022: CIO registration
- NEC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beatriz Abad Garis | Chair | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Carneros Diaz | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Silvia Villarroya Lidon | Trustee | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Requena Casado | Trustee | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE SPANISH LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS BY PROVIDING SPANISH LANGUAGE CLASSES AND ORGANISING ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF SPAIN AND SPANISH SPEAKING COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 PENDINE CLOSE
Y BARRI
92 Pendine Close
CF62 9DE
- Phone:
- 07453937938
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window