GRACEFUL HANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the CIO is to advance in the Islamic faith throughout England for the benefit of the public in accordance with the statement of Faith mainly but not exclusively through the holding of services and meetings, religious and supplementary education, maintaining a library of Islamic literature, outreach and pastoral case.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Afzal Ali Mahmad Bhamji | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ALI PATEL | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ebrahim Yusuf Patel | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE IN THE ISLAMIC FAITH THROUGHOUT ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF SERVICES AND MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS AND SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION, MAINTAINING A LIBRARY OF ISLAMIC LITERATURE, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 AUDLEY LANE
BLACKBURN
BB1 1LT
- Phone:
- 07727654544
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window