NEW MILTON MEMORIAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre is held on trust as a War Memorial and Community Facility for the use of the inhabitants of the civil parish of New Milton without distinction of political, religious, or other opinions including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare to improve the conditions of life for the inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 September 2022: CIO registration
- 19 March 2024: Funds received from 270889 NEW MILTON WAR MEMORIAL HALL
- NEW MILTON WAR MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony John Almeda | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Stevenson | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Parslow | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £163.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £198.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE CENTRE SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST AS A WAR MEMORIAL FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY FACILITY FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF NEW MILTON ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW MILTON MEMORIAL CENTRE
WHITEFIELD ROAD
NEW MILTON
BH25 6DE
- Phone:
- 01425629451
- Email:
- MANAGER@MEMCENTRE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window