SPAYS4STRAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to individuals carrying out neutering Making grants to organisations carrying out neutering Fundraising Spay/Neutering campaigns
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Romania
Governance
- 21 November 2022: CIO registration
- SPAYS4STRAYS CIC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline McCallum | Chair | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Tennie | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lamont | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Rollins | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £695 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS IN ROMANIA, TURKEY AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SPAYING AND NEUTERING SERVICES TO HOMELESS CATS AND DOGS AND THOSE BELONGING TO OWNERS OF LIMITED FINANCIAL MEANS, DESIGNED TO CONTROL THE POPULATION OF UNWANTED ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spays4Strays
86-90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 02045383248
- Email:
- enquiries@spays4strays.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window