WEST DENTON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have sought to advance the Christian faith by teaching the Christian Scriptures to our members and our local community through our Sunday meetings, midweek groups and training events. We have sought to support and care for those in need both within our church community and the community at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 17 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Carvel | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luke Daniel Parker | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carly Frame | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH OUR STATEMENTS OF FAITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SERVICES FOR PRAYER AND WORSHIP, CHRISTIAN TEACHING, PASTORAL CARE, AND OUTREACH WORK IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 THE BURNSIDE
WEST DENTON
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE5 5BR
- Phone:
- 07849162717
- Email:
- catherinecarvel@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window