FINCHLEY FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide approximately three days of emergency food for people living in financial hardship in the London Borough of Barnet. This is done through two weekly sessions at St Mary's parish centre in East Finchley where clients can choose items of food and toiletries. Clients are interviewed when registering with us in order to ascertain their needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
175 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 29 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Woodward | Chair | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Katerina Kydoniefs | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ramsey | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helena Pugh MSc, PhD | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Father Peter Michael Scott STB, MTh. | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oladipo Oyewole | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sarah Doran FCCA | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS CATHOLIC CHURCH
279 HIGH ROAD
LONDON
N2 8HG
- Phone:
- 07849558307
- Email:
- Finchleyfoodbank@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window