NORTHAMPTON GUARDIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northampton Guardians operate a safe-guarding service in the night-time economy, each weekend in Northampton Town centre. Our services include simple support such as providing water, flip flops or phone charging, and extend to providing a safe space for people, basic first aid, safe-guarding of vulnerable people, and ensuring that anyone vulnerable has a safe way home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Lee Craven | Chair | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kyle John Mills | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN LESLEY GOODSHIP | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN NORTHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE VULNERABLE OR OTHERWISE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR ENGAGEMENT WITH NORTHAMPTON’S NIGHT-TIME ECONOMY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SAFEGUARDING SERVICES INCLUDING VOLUNTEER PATROLS, A SAFE SPACE IN WHICH EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT CAN BE DELIVERED, ENSURING SAFE PASSAGE HOME AND THE PROVISION OF BASIC FIRST AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 EASTON LANE
BOZEAT
WELLINGBOROUGH
31
EASTON LANE BOZEAT
NN29 7NN
- Phone:
- 07437546586
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window