JAMIL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief from financial hardship among people living in the United Kingdom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 July 2022: CIO registration
- TECH BANK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nasir Jamil | Chair | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aamna Ahmad | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Farah Nasir | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Azwar Bin Zahoor | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY PROVIDING PERSONS WITH LIMITED MEANS WITH NEW AND REFURBISHED COMPUTERS, IT EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ELECTRICAL DEVICES THAT WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Yew Tree Road
Tunbridge Wells
TN4 0BD
- Phone:
- 01892544199
- Email:
- help@jamiltrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window