GOOD MOOD CREATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Peter Doggett | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amy Jessica Mitchell | Trustee |
|
||||||
Caroline Emma Dixon | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Merryn Macnamara | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ka Wai Athena Wu | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A. THE PROMOTION OF THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING PERFORMING ARTS PROGRAMMES DESIGNED TO IMPROVE MENTAL HEALTH AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE HEALTH BENEFITS OF ARTS ACTIVITY AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH. B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS BY PROMOTING PARTICIPATION IN HIGH QUALITY PERFORMING ARTS ACTIVITY THROUGH WORKSHOPS, PROJECTS AND PERFORMANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07505584742
- Email:
- amandakelleher1@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window