MACCLESFIELD AND CONGLETON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION AND ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AUSPICES OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
91 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 12 May 1964: Standard registration
- MACCLESFIELD AND CONGLETON BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDER JAMES FLETCHER | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Vinod Raval | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham McColl Naismith | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Grenville Garton | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|||||
David John Bird | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ephram Luke Graves | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES BROWN | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK RUSSELL EDEN | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.54k | £64.01k | £100.68k | £173.98k | £170.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.98k | £113.79k | £88.97k | £138.31k | £175.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.10k | £22.67k | £34.17k | £5.33k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND SEPTEMBER, 1929.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE MACCLESFIELD AND CONGLETON BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
MACCLESFIELD, CONGLETON AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 West Bond Street
MACCLESFIELD
Cheshire
SK11 8EQ
- Phone:
- 01625 423338
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window